+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Privileges and Elections
- VOTE: RECOMMIT (25-Y 15-N)
- Motion for recommittal to committee agreed to (25-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION (16-Y 24-N)
- Previous question, not ordered (16-Y 24-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 965396812
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION (16-Y 24-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: RECOMMIT (25-Y 15-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor