+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14103158D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
February 25, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor