+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/24)
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB628ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (80-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (80-Y 19-N)
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N)
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
On March 26, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB628ER)
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N)
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (78-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: Passage (78-Y 18-N)
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 26, 2024 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N)
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 2024 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On February 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 24106958D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB628S1
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Incorporates SB345 (Reeves)
- Committee substitute printed 24106958D-S1
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
On January 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming
On January 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101505D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology