+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0954)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 16-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 954 (effective 4/17/96)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (79-Y 16-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 1-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB627ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 1-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (95-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (20-Y 2-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause 961200812
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE (37-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 16-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (36-Y 1-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N)
March 4, 1996: Reported from Finance with amd. (20-Y 2-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1996: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1996: VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor