+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0190)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 190 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB626ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB626S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104651D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14104651D-S1
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14103602D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 10, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor