+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 765 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB624ER)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Sherwood, Byron, Plum
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senators: Bell, Ruff, McDougle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (5-Y 34-N)
- House amendment rejected by Senate (5-Y 34-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 069213700-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB624S1
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 069213700-S1
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 067245700
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (5-Y 34-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor