+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB624ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 14103162D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB624E
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 14103162D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 1-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
January 31, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor