+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective -see bill)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB623ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB623S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104963D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104963D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 14103946D
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor