+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
On April 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 677 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB623ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 960076667-S1
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 960076667-S1
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Delegates: Guest, Thomas, Brickley
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Hawkins, Potts, Reasor
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE SUB. (5-Y 35-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (5-Y 35-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Substitute bill reprinted 960065667-H1
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 960065667-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 960065667-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 960065667-H1
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 2
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960043815