+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB622ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N)
- Passed House (92-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 4-N)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB622S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104727D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10104727D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 10103596D
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N)
February 23, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (18-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor