+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 707 (effective 7/1/22)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB62ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB62ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Robinson, Coyner, Guzman
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Favola, Locke, Vogel
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 22102668D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB62E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102668D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (13)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2022: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
March 10, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2022: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2022: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2022: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2022: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2022: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2022: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor