+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unanimous Reconsideration of passage rejected by Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- Chair votes yes
- Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 14103482D