+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0707)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 707 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB615ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read second time
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103427D
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Engrossed by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor