+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB614ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 989406655
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (39-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (30-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor