+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB612ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080569328
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor