+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB610ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (87-Y 8-N)
- Passed House (87-Y 8-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102793D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 8-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 22, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Emmett W. Hanger, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor