+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 173 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0173)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB61ER)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments #3 and #4 agreed to
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB61E2
- Printed as reengrossed 18100343D-E2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
- Recommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB61E
- Printed as engrossed 18100343D-E
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100343D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services