+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 4/11/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB609ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Claims (13-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Miller rejected
- Passed House (89-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (89-Y 9-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Claims
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7235605 (SB609S1)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 3-N)
March 10, 1994: Reported from Claims (13-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (89-Y 9-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor