+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 722 (effective 4/6/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB609ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (9-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 14103285D
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2014: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor