+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103578D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
January 30, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor