+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB607ER)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Amendment by Del. Kilgore agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (89-Y 9-N)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (14-Y 7-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB607S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 044063836-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 044063836-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 044035836