+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 4/6/94)
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB607ER)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- Amendment by Sen. Wampler agreed to
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD1023812 (SB607E)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 1-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor