+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB605ER)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 18107512D-H1
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107512D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB605H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107512D-H1
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment rejected
- Floor substitute printed 18107125D-S1 (Stanley)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Stanley agreed to 18107125D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB605S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100465D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor