+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
On April 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB604ER)
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of House sub. agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 022326512-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 022326512-H1
- Read third time
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 022326512-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 022758512
+ − Votes (9)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 1-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2002: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor