+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (57)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0829)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 15-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 6-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 6-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 829 (effective 7/1/12)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB603ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 12106302D-S2
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB603ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N)
- Conference substitute printed 12106104D-S1
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 16-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (81-Y 16-N)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 2-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: McWaters, Black, Favola
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Iaquinto, Loupassi, Herring
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N)
- Passed House with substitute (77-Y 21-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB603H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105808D-H1
- Read third time
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105808D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 1-N)
- Reconsidered by Courts of Justice
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (8-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 4-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented and ordered printed 12104002D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (15)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 15-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 6-N 1-A)
March 10, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 9-N)
March 10, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N)
March 10, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 16-N)
March 8, 2012: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
March 8, 2012: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 2-N)
March 7, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 21-N)
March 2, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N)
February 27, 2012: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (8-Y 9-N)
February 13, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
February 6, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor