+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0377)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB602ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 14103630D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor