+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (24-Y 15-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 067088808
+ − Votes (3)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: (24-Y 15-N)
January 20, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor