+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 3/30/12)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB602ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 12103254D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB602E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 12103254D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor