+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 9, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- Defeated (39-Y 59-N)
- Defeated by House (39-Y 59-N)
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: --- AGREE TO (95-Y 1-N)
- Amendments by Delegate Armstrong agreed to (95-Y 1-N)
- Motion by Delegate Marshall, R.G. withdrawn
- Motion by Del. Marshall, R. G. to pass by Delegate Armstrong floor amendments
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (0-Y 98-N)
- Substitute by Delegate Athey rejected 089893420-H1 (0-Y 98-N)
- Floor substitute printed 089893420-H1 (Athey)
- Pending question ordered
- Read third time
On June 27, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Rules without recommendation (11-Y 4-N)
On June 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 084955324-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 084955324-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB6009S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (21-Y 16-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 1-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Stolle rejected (13-Y 24-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB6009S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On June 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Transportation (9-Y 4-N)
On June 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 082995324
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- Defeated (39-Y 59-N)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (0-Y 98-N)
July 9, 2008: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (95-Y 1-N)
June 26, 2008: Reported from Rules without recommendation (11-Y 4-N)
June 25, 2008: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (36-Y 1-N)
June 25, 2008: Amendments by Senator Stolle rejected (13-Y 24-N)
June 25, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
June 25, 2008: Passed Senate (21-Y 16-N)
June 25, 2008: Reported from Finance with substitute (9-Y 5-N)
June 25, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
June 25, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
June 24, 2008: Rereferred from Transportation (9-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard L. Saslaw
Type:
Primary Sponsor