+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB0005-Gartlan)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 981752693
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (3)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor