+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB60ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 14101070D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB60E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On December 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101070D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor