+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0039)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 39 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB60ER)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/28/01 022174560
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2002: Reported from Agr., Chesapeake & Natural Res. (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2002: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor