+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 553 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB598ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 986956685
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1998: Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor