+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Continued to 1995 in H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 1994: Continued to 1995 in H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor