+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Left in Finance
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: 3
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 14-N 1-A)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB597E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 086539284-E
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086539284
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 14-N 1-A)
February 13, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor