+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB597ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103775D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2022: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2022: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor