+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0944)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 944 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB594ER)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 004863508-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 004863508