+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 49-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Read third time
- Defeated by House (49-Y 49-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Defeated by House (48-Y 51-N)
- Read third time
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: DEFEATED (48-Y 51-N)
- Rec. of defeated action agreed to by House (49-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (49-Y 47-N)
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (11-Y 10-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rec. of defeat. action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (19-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (21-Y 19-N)
- Motion to reconsider passage fails (31-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (31-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (9-Y 6-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 984215745
+ − Votes (11)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 49-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: DEFEATED (48-Y 51-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (49-Y 47-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. (11-Y 10-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (31-Y 5-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (21-Y 19-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (19-Y 21-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from R. & S. S. (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor