+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB591S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107051D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107051D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100722D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2020: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Emmett W. Hanger, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor