+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
On April 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB591ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB591ER)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 968052629-S1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 968052629-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 968052629-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Higher Education
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 960914807
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor