+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB591ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (25-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 003746508-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 003746508-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 003746508-S1
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Presented & ordered printed 008952508
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amds (25-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: Reported from R. & S. S. w/substitute (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor