+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 77 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB59ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider reading dispensed agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102040D
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Motion to reconsider reading dispensed agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor