+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. I. B. w/amd. (14-Y 8-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 974170629-S1
- Read second time
On January 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On January 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On December 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 962387629
On December 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 974170629-S1
On December 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 962387629
+ − Votes (5)
February 11, 1997: Passed by indefinitely in C. I. B. w/amd. (14-Y 8-N)
January 14, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 9, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
December 16, 1996: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1996: Continued to 1997 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor