+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0682)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 682 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB589ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #4
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102795D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2010: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
February 15, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor