+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 354 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB588ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (10-Y 9-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 12103069D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (5)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (10-Y 9-N)
February 13, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor