+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1011)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1011 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB584ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 20108447D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB584H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108447D-H1
- Read third time
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108447D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20103064D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB584E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103064D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
T. Montgomery "Monty" Mason
Type:
Primary Sponsor