+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 2 (effective 2/11/08)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB582ER)
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/07 086340818
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2008: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor