+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (15-Y 25-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation (15-Y 25-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 31, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB580ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed