+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB580ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB580S2
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106874D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 18106521D-S1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Incorporates SB804 (Carrico)
- Committee substitute printed 18106874D-S2
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: #2
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103234D