+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB58ER)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 11-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 11-N)
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (22-Y 17-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Delegates: Wardrup, Rust, Bland
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (38-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Watkins, Puckett, O'Brien
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENTS (15-Y 22-N)
- House amendments rejected by Senate (15-Y 22-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A)
- Passed House with amendments (88-Y 11-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds (20-Y 1-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 14-N)
- Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 048255760-ES1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute w/amd. SB58ES1
- Amendment by Sen. Stolle agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amendment by Sen. Stolle withdrawn
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 048255760-S1 (Martin)
- Substitute by Sen. Martin agreed to 048255760-S1
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/24/03 042292760
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (11)
March 12, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 11-N)
March 12, 2004: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (22-Y 17-N)
March 5, 2004: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (38-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: REJECT HOUSE AMENDMENTS (15-Y 22-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Tra. w/amds (20-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 14-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (27-Y 12-N)
January 26, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor